+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Finance Postpone Indefinitely
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
- House Second Reading Laid Over
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Finance
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (11)
May 7, 2013: Senate Finance: FINAL VOTE - Postpone House Bill 13-1251 indefinitely. The motion passed on a vote of 5-0.
April 19, 2013: House Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1251, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. The motion passed on a vote of 9-4.
April 18, 2013: House Finance: FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1251 to the Committee on Appropriations. The motion passed on a vote of 8-5.
April 11, 2013: House Judiciary: FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1251, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. The motion passed on a vote of 9-2.
April 11, 2013: House Judiciary: FINAL VOTE - Reconsider the previous motion to adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment F). The motion passed on a vote of 7-4.
April 11, 2013: House Judiciary: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment E). The motion was withdrawn a second time.
April 11, 2013: House Judiciary: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment F). The motion passed on a vote of 6-5.
April 11, 2013: House Judiciary: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment D). The motion passed on a vote of 7-4.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor