+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (16)
On June 4, 2015 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On May 13, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 12, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
On April 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
On April 17, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 10, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
On February 27, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (12)
April 28, 2015: Senate Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.003 The motion passed without objection.
April 28, 2015: Senate Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1249, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. The motion passed on a vote of 5-2.
April 23, 2015: Senate Finance: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.010 (Attachment B). The motion passed without objection.
April 23, 2015: Senate Finance: FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1249, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. The motion passed on a vote of 3-2.
April 23, 2015: Senate Finance: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.009 (Attachment A). The motion passed without objection.
April 23, 2015: Senate Finance: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.011 (Attachment C). The motion passed without objection.
April 10, 2015: House Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1249, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. The motion passed on a vote of 10-3.
April 10, 2015: House Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 The motion passed without objection.
March 25, 2015: House Finance: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment K). The motion passed without objection.
March 25, 2015: House Finance: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment I). The motion passed without objection.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor