+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (16)
On June 6, 2017 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On May 18, 2017 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 17, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On May 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
On April 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Amended to Appropriations
On April 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- House Committee on Business Affairs and Labor Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs and Labor
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor