+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 9, 2018 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On April 4, 2018 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On April 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 4, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On March 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On March 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy
On March 9, 2018 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On February 16, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor