+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On April 7, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 6, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 13, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance
+ − Votes (2)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor