+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (14)
On June 1, 2018 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On May 16, 2018 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 16, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On May 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
On May 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On May 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On April 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
On April 25, 2018 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 24, 2018 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
On April 23, 2018 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On April 18, 2018 in the House:
- House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor