+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 8, 2015 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On March 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 27, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On March 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Business Affairs and Labor Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs and Labor
+ − Votes (2)
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor