+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 8, 2015 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On April 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
On April 7, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 6, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources Refer Unamended to Finance
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources + Finance
+ − Votes (3)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor