+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 28, 2013 in the House:
- Governor Action - Signed
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed
On May 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary
On April 26, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over Daily
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary