+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 28, 2013 in the House:
- Governor Action - Signed
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Transportation Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Laid Over Daily
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over Daily
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Amended to Appropriations
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Energy
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (7)
April 29, 2013: Senate Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Consent Calendar The motion passed without objection.
April 25, 2013: Senate Transportation: FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1240 to the Committee on Appropriations. The motion passed on a vote of 5-0.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor