+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 28, 2013 in the House:
- Governor Action - Signed
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily
On May 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Laid Over Daily
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On April 12, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
- House Second Reading Laid Over Daily
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (7)
April 30, 2013: Senate Finance: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.013 (Attachment E). The motion passed without objection.
April 30, 2013: Senate Finance: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.011 (Attachment C). The motion passed without objection.
April 30, 2013: Senate Finance: FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1238, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. The motion passed on a vote of 3-2.
April 30, 2013: Senate Finance: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.012 (Attachment D). The motion passed without objection.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor