+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (16)
On June 1, 2019 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On May 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 15, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 14, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On April 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
On April 26, 2019 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- House Committee on Education Refer Amended to Appropriations
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- House Committee on Education Lay Over Unamended - Amendment(s) Failed
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Education + Appropriations
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor