+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On May 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Finance Postpone Indefinitely
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Amended to Finance
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Energy + Finance