+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (9)
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
On April 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
On April 23, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 17, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
On April 6, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Business Affairs and Labor Refer Amended to Appropriations
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs and Labor
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor