+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 10, 2013 in the House:
- Governor Action - Signed
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily
On April 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed
On March 8, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources Refer Unamended to Finance
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources