+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 29, 2015 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On May 14, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 11, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
On April 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Appropriations
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 17, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 10, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (11)
April 24, 2015: Senate Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1233, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. The motion passed on a vote of 5-2.
April 22, 2015: Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.010. The motion passed without objection.
April 10, 2015: House Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 The motion passed without objection.
April 10, 2015: House Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1233, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. The motion passed on a vote of 11-2.
March 31, 2015: House Public Health Care & Human Services: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment F). The motion passed without objection.
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor