+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 14, 2015 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On May 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 8, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 6, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On April 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On March 27, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On March 13, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services