+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (15)
On June 5, 2013 in the House:
- Governor Action - Signed
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over Daily
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (7)
April 29, 2013: Senate Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Consent Calendar The motion passed without objection.
April 24, 2013: Senate Judiciary: FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1230 to the Committee on Appropriations. The motion passed on a vote of 5-0.
April 1, 2013: House Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - COW - amended The motion passed on a vote of 13-0.
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor