+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 29, 2015 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On May 11, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 8, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary + Appropriations
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
On April 10, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On April 6, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over to 04/10/2015 - No Amendments
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Referred to Appropriations - No Amendments
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary + Appropriations
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
April 24, 2015: Senate Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1229 to the Committee of the Whole. The motion passed on a vote of 4-3.
April 20, 2015: Senate Judiciary: FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1229 to the Committee on Appropriations. The motion passed on a vote of 5-0.
April 2, 2015: House Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 The motion passed without objection.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor