+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Governor Action - Signed
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On March 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass
On March 15, 2013 in the House:
- House Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- First Conference Committee Result was to Adopt Rerevised w/ Amendments
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Not Concur - Request Conference Committee
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments
On March 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Appropriations
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed
On February 15, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary