+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (18)
On June 5, 2017 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On May 18, 2017 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 17, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On May 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
On April 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over to 05/01/2017
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
- Senate Third Reading Reconsidered - No Amendments
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology
On April 17, 2017 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 13, 2017 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- House Committee on Business Affairs and Labor Refer Amended to Finance
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs and Labor