+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 10, 2013 in the House:
- Governor Action - Signed
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On April 28, 2013 in the House:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed
On April 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Local Government Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Local Government Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed
On March 15, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development Lay Over Unamended - Amendment(s) Failed
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (10)
April 16, 2013: Senate Local Government: FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L. 010 (Attachment D). The motion passed without objection.
April 16, 2013: Senate Local Government: FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L. 008 (Attachment B). The motion passed without objection.
April 16, 2013: Senate Local Government: FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L. 009 (Attachment C). The motion passed without objection.
April 16, 2013: Senate Local Government: FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer HB 13-1225 to the Committee of the Whole, as amended. The motion passed on a vote of 3-2.
+ − Sponsors (4)
LEVY
Type:
Primary Sponsor