+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 13, 2015 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On April 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Local Government Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Local Government Refer Amended to Appropriations
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Local Government