+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 8, 2015 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On March 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 27, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Business Affairs and Labor Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs and Labor