+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (15)
On June 10, 2016 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On May 18, 2016 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 17, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 10, 2016 in the House:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On May 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
On May 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
On May 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
On April 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
On April 29, 2016 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 28, 2016 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- House Committee on Education Refer Amended to Appropriations
On February 4, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Education
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (11)
May 6, 2016: Senate Appropriations: . .HB16-1222
May 6, 2016: Senate Appropriations: . .HB16-1222
May 5, 2016: Senate Appropriations: . .HB16-1222
May 5, 2016: Senate Appropriations: . .HB16-1222
May 3, 2016: Senate Finance: . .HB16-1222
May 3, 2016: Senate Finance: . .HB16-1222
April 28, 2016: House Appropriations: . .HB16-1222
April 28, 2016: House Appropriations: . .HB16-1222
March 7, 2016: House Education: . .HB16-1222
March 7, 2016: House Education: . .HB16-1222
March 7, 2016: House Education: . .HB16-1222
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor