+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (15)
On June 8, 2017 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On May 2, 2017 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 1, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On April 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 13, 2017 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On March 10, 2017 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over to 03/13/2017 - No Amendments
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance + Appropriations