+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (19)
On June 5, 2015 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On May 11, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 8, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Floor
On April 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance + Appropriations
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 10, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Unamended to Finance
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Energy + Finance + Appropriations