+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 14, 2015 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On May 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 4, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On April 27, 2015 in the House:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
On April 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Amended to Appropriations
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Business Affairs and Labor Refer Amended to Appropriations
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs and Labor
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (9)
April 17, 2015: Senate Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1217 to the Committee of the Whole. The motion passed on a vote of 7-0.
March 17, 2015: Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003. The motion passed without objection.
March 17, 2015: Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004. The motion passed without objection.
March 6, 2015: House Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 The motion passed without objection.
February 26, 2015: House Business Affairs and Labor: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment D). The motion passed without objection.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor