+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (7)
On May 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
On May 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
On May 6, 2016 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On May 5, 2016 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations
On February 4, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (7)
May 5, 2016: House Appropriations: . .HB16-1216
May 5, 2016: House Appropriations: . .HB16-1216
May 5, 2016: House Appropriations: . .HB16-1216
March 8, 2016: House Judiciary: . .HB16-1216
March 8, 2016: House Judiciary: . .HB16-1216
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor