+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 21, 2016 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On April 11, 2016 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On April 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On March 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- House Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On February 4, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary
+ − Votes (2)
March 28, 2016: Senate Judiciary: . .HB16-1215
March 3, 2016: House Judiciary: . .HB16-1215
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor