+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 4, 2015 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On April 24, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On April 23, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
- Senate Third Reading Reconsidered - No Amendments
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 20, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On March 13, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Education + Appropriations
+ − Votes (3)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor