+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Finance Postpone Indefinitely
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Laid Over Daily
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations
On February 1, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary + Appropriations
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (5)
May 7, 2013: Senate Finance: FINAL VOTE - Postpone House Bill 13-1214 indefinitely. The motion passed on a vote of 5-0.
April 17, 2013: House Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1214, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. The motion passed on a vote of 8-4.
April 17, 2013: House Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 The motion passed on a vote of 9-3.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor