+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 20, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On March 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 20, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On March 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Health, Insurance, & Environment Refer Amended to Appropriations
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Health, Insurance, & Environment
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
March 6, 2015: House Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.010 The motion passed without objection.
February 26, 2015: House Health, Insurance, & Environment: FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1211, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. The motion passed on a vote of 13-0.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor