+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 25, 2022 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On April 19, 2022 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On April 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 18, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On April 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On March 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On March 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary
On March 4, 2022 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 3, 2022 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On February 22, 2022 in the House:
- House Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On February 8, 2022 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary