+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (15)
On July 11, 2020 in the House:
- Governor Vetoed
On July 2, 2020 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On July 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On July 2, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On June 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On June 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
On June 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On June 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
On June 5, 2020 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On June 4, 2020 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Floor
On June 3, 2020 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On February 12, 2020 in the House:
- House Committee on Transportation & Local Government Refer Unamended to Finance
On January 30, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Local Government