+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (21)
On June 5, 2013 in the House:
- Governor Action - Signed
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On May 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily
On April 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Laid Over Daily
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Local Government Refer Amended to Finance
On February 1, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Local Government + Finance
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
February 27, 2013: House Finance: FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1206 to the Committee of the Whole. The motion passed on a vote of 10-1.
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor