+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (9)
On April 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Postpone Indefinitely
On April 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Legislative Council Refer Amended to Appropriations
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended to Legislative Council
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology
On April 7, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 6, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance