+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (9)
On May 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Postpone Indefinitely
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Education Refer Amended to Appropriations
On April 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education + Appropriations
On April 27, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 23, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 17, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Education Refer Amended to Appropriations
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Education + Appropriations
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (5)
April 17, 2015: House Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1201, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. The motion passed on a vote of 10-3.
April 17, 2015: House Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 The motion passed without objection.
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor