+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 11, 2013 in the House:
- Governor Action - Signed
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations
On February 1, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
April 9, 2013: House Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1196 to the Committee of the Whole. The motion passed on a vote of 13-0.
February 19, 2013: House Public Health Care & Human Services: FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1196, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. The motion passed on a vote of 13-0.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor