+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 28, 2013 in the House:
- Governor Action - Signed
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On April 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary + Appropriations
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Appropriations
On February 1, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs + Appropriations