+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 13, 2017 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On April 7, 2017 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On April 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Education Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On March 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- House Committee on Education Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Education
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor