+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (9)
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 17, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
On April 10, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over to 04/20/2015 - No Amendments
On April 6, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over to 04/10/2015 - No Amendments
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On January 30, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services
+ − Votes (3)
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor