+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (17)
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On April 13, 2017 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On April 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On March 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On March 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 03/27/2017 - No Amendments
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Local Government Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On March 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On March 3, 2017 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- House Committee on Business Affairs and Labor Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs and Labor