+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 3, 2013 in the House:
- Governor Action - Signed
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed
On March 15, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over Daily
On March 8, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance + Appropriations