+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (10)
On April 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only
On April 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
On March 26, 2014 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 25, 2014 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On March 24, 2014 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On March 20, 2014 in the House:
- House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- House Committee on Judiciary Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- House Committee on Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development Refer Unamended to Judiciary
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (10)
March 20, 2014: House Judiciary: FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1187, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. The motion passed on a vote of 11-0.
March 20, 2014: House Judiciary: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.015 (Attachment A), Severed Section A. The motion failed on a vote of 5-6.
March 20, 2014: House Judiciary: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.009 (Attachment B). A substitute motion to adopt Amendment L.008 (Attachment C) passed.
March 20, 2014: House Judiciary: FINAL VOTE - Reconsider amendment L.008. The motion passed on a vote of 10-1.
March 20, 2014: House Judiciary: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.008 (Attachment C). The motion passed on a vote of 6-5.
March 20, 2014: House Judiciary: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.015 (Attachment A), Severed Section B. The motion was withdrawn.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor