+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 29, 2015 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On May 1, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 1, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On April 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On April 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 27, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Health, Insurance, & Environment Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Health, Insurance, & Environment + Appropriations