+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 15, 2014 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On April 30, 2014 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On April 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 29, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On April 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On March 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On March 7, 2014 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- House Committee on Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development Refer Amended to Appropriations
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development