+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 8, 2015 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On March 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On March 27, 2015 in the House:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Education Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 2, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Education Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Education
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor