+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 27, 2014 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 17, 2014 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 14, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On March 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On February 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology
On February 17, 2014 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 14, 2014 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- House Committee on Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
February 11, 2014: House Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003. See substitute motion below.
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor