+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- Governor Action - Signed
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed
On March 15, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over Daily
On March 8, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance